Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466910

EP3466910 - HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ibiden Co., Ltd.
2-1, Kanda-cho
Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KOGA, Yoshihiro
c/o IBIDEN CO. LTD. OGAKI-KITA PLANT
1-1 Kitagata
Ibigawa-cho
Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Vigand, Philippe , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex - Genève / CH
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17810265.305.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20834
Priority number, dateJP2016011274106.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016112741
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213089
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466910
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:C04B41/85, B28B11/08, C04B35/573, F28F21/04, C04B35/636, C04B35/638, C04B38/00
[2019/45]
Former International [2019/15]C04B41/85, B28B11/08, C04B35/573, F28F21/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:WABENSTRUKTURHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE PRODUCTION METHOD[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2018Translation filed 
09.11.2018National basic fee paid 
09.11.2018Search fee paid 
09.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[XY]JP2012211071  (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [X] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0006], [0011] to [0021]; examples; fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 7-8;
 [XY]WO2012043758  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0041]; examples & US 2013/0213620 A1 examples & EP 2623917 A1 * [Y] 7-8;
 [Y]JPH11291220  (NGK INSULATORS LTD, et al) [Y] 7-8 * , claims; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2001269921  (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [Y] 7-8 * , claims; examples; fig. 7 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2002001720  (TOKIN CORP) [Y] 7-8 * , claims; fig. 3 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS59177913  (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 7-8 * , claims (Family: none) *