Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3466910 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3466910



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 117
22.10.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.10.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
25.09.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
09.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
09.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
09.11.2018 Description Search / examination 21
09.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 5
09.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 25