Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3466910


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2019 Supplementary search report published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
04.10.2019 Change - classification published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
04.10.2019 Change - classification published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
02.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.2018 Change - representative
09.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication