Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3466910

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure09.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2018Translation filed 
09.11.2018National basic fee paid 
09.11.2018Search fee paid 
09.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Countries concerned:MA MD
 
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20181109
 
Event date:11.09.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (IN ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:11.09.2019 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20191004
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C04B 38/00 20060101ALI20190927BHEP
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C04B 35/638 20060101ALI20190927BHEP
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C04B 35/573 20060101ALI20190927BHEP
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C04B 41/85 20060101AFI20190927BHEP
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C04B 35/636 20060101ALI20190927BHEP
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F28F 21/04 20060101ALI20190927BHEP
 
Event date:06.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B28B 11/08 20060101ALI20190927BHEP