Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467459

EP3467459 - TEMPERATURE ESTIMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MIZUNO, Kota
c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / TOYAMA, Satoru
c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / NISHIURA, Ryuichi
c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / AMIMOTO, Tsuyoshi
c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
05 / KURIYAMA, Ryota
c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17810291.906.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20925
Priority number, dateJP2016011358007.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016113580
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213116
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467459
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01K7/42
[2019/25]
Former International [2019/15]G01K11/00, G01N33/28, H01F41/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURSCHÄTZVERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:TEMPERATURE ESTIMATION METHOD[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018Translation filed 
30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Search fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JP3018718B  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0024] *;
 [A]JP2002350426  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0048] *;
 [A]JP5872127B  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 EP3327736  [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * figures 1, 4-10 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0042] *
International search[A]JPS6131824B  (Fuji Electric Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-7 * , column 3, line 8 to column 4, line 39; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008241451  (YUKA IND KK) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0051]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008182161  (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0025] to [0052]; fig. 1 to 3 & CN 101231278 A & KR 10-2008-0070581 A *;
 [A]JP2002350426  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH05249100  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0032]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP3081717U  (Yuka Industries Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO03075294  (KOHLI ANIL [IN]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & AU 2002311624 A1 *
by applicantJP2013131511
 JPH05249100
    - Z. WANG; X. WANG; X. YI; S. LI, "Gas Generation in Natural Ester and Mineral Oil Under Partial Discharge and Sparking Faults", IEEE Electrical Insulation Magazine, (20130000), vol. 29, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/MEI.2013.6585858, pages 62 - 70, XP011525148

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEI.2013.6585858
    - DENKI KYODO KENKYU, Aburairi Hen-atsuki no Hoshu Kanri, Electric Technology Research Association, (19990200), vol. 54
    - Denki Kyodo Kenkyu, Electric Technology Research Association, vol. 54, page 33