Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3467459 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3467459



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 206
27.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
27.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.11.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
27.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 11
20.05.2019 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 16
20.05.2019 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 22
20.05.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
20.05.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
08.05.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
09.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
30.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.11.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
30.11.2018 Description Search / examination 26
30.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 15
30.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.04.2018 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 2
07.03.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 34