Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470066

EP3470066 - CAROTENOID-CONTAINING COGNITIVE FUNCTION IMPROVING COMPOSITION FOR USE IN EXERCISE THERAPY FOR COGNITIVE FUNCTION IMPROVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstaReal Co., Ltd.
55 Yokohoonji
Kamiichi-machi
Nakaniikawa-gun, Toyama 930-0397 / JP
For all designated states
University of Tsukuba
1-1-1, Tennodai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SOYA, Hideaki
c/o UNIVERSITY OF TSUKUBA
1-1-1 Tennodai
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP
02 / YOOK, Jangsoo
c/o UNIVERSITY OF TSUKUBA
1-1-1 Tennodai
Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810371.907.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP21203
Priority number, dateJP2016011446808.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016114468
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213197
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470066
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/015, A23L33/10, A61K31/122, A61K36/05
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:CAROTINOIDHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KOGNITIVEN FUNKTION ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER ÜBUNGSTHERAPIE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KOGNITIVEN FUNKTION[2019/16]
English:CAROTENOID-CONTAINING COGNITIVE FUNCTION IMPROVING COMPOSITION FOR USE IN EXERCISE THERAPY FOR COGNITIVE FUNCTION IMPROVEMENT[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITION AMÉLIORANT LA FONCTION COGNITIVE CONTENANT DES CAROTÉNOÏDES DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UNE THÉRAPIE D'EXERCICE POUR AMÉLIORER LA FONCTION COGNITIVE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
15.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2007126455  (FUJI CHEM IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , claims 1, 5; paragraphs [0008], [0012], [0027], [0033], [0043], [0046] to [0052] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2006116161  (KYOKUKO BUSSAN KK) [Y] 8-11 * , paragraphs [0003], [0013] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]  - JANGSOO YOOK et al., "Tennen Yurai Supplement to Kaiba no Kino Sokushin", Taiiku no Kagaku, (20150101), vol. 65, no. 1, ISSN 0039-8985, pages 21 - 27, XP009515023 [Y] 1-11 * , page 21, left column, lines 1 to 16, page 22, right column, lines 7 to 21, page 23, line 2 to right column, line 10, page 24, left column, line 5 to right column, line 9, page 25, left column, line 6 to page 26, left column, line 9, page 24, right column, line 9 to page 25, left column, line 5, fig. 1 to 5 *
 [Y]  - YOOK et al., "Astaxanthin supplementation enhances adult hippocampal neurogenesis and spatial memory in mice", Molecular Nutrition and Food Research, (20160107), vol. 60, no. 3, ISSN 1613-4133, pages 589 - 599, XP055599177 [Y] 10, 11 * , Abstract, Figure 4~6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mnfr.201500634
by applicantJPH08103288
 JPH0568585
    - KIM J. H.; NAM S.W.; KIM B, W.; CHOI W. et al., "Astaxanthin improves stem cell potency via an increase in the proliferation of neural progenitor cells", Int. J. mol. Sci., (20100000), vol. 11, pages 5109 - 5119
    - LU Y.; XIE T.; HE X. X.; MAO Z. F. et al., "Astaxanthin rescues neuron loss and attenuates oxidative stress induced by amygdala kindling in adult rat hippocampus", Neurosci. Lett., (20150000), vol. 597, pages 49 - 53
    - ERICKSON KI; VOSS MW; PRAKASH RS; BASAK C; SZABO A; CHADDOCK L; KIM JS; HEO S; ALVES H; WHITE SM, "Exercise training increases size of hippocampus and improves memory", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 3017 - 3022
    - BYUN K; HYODO K; SUWABE K; OCHI G; SAKAIRI Y; KATO M; DAN I, SOYA, "Positive effect of acute mild exercise on executive function via arousal-related prefrontal activations: an fNIRS study", Neuroimage, (20140000), vol. 98, pages 336 - 345
    - BEAVER WL; WASSERMAN K; WHIPP BJ., "A New Method for Detecting Anaerobic Threshold by Gas-Exchange", J Appl Physiol, (19860000), vol. 60, pages 2020 - 2027
    - MATEIKA JH; DUFFIN J., "Ventilatory responses to exercise performed below and above the first ventilatory treshold", Eur J Appl Physiol Occup Physiol, (19940000), vol. 68, pages 327 - 335
    - SOYA H; MUKAI A; DEOCARIS CC; OHIWA N; CHANG H; NISHIJIMA T; FUJIKAWA T; TOGASHI K; SAI TO T, "Threshold-like pattern of neuronal activation in the hypothalamus during treadmill running: establishment of a minimum running stress (MRS) rat model", Neurosci Res, (20070000), vol. 58, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neures.2007.04.004, pages 341 - 348, XP022188779

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neures.2007.04.004
    - INOUE K; HANAOKA Y; NISHIJIMA T; OKAMOTO M; CHANG H; SAITO T; SOYA H, "Long-term mild exercise training enhances hippocampus-dependent memory in rats", Int J Sports Med, (20150000), vol. 36, pages 280 - 285
    - INOUE K; OKAMOTO M; SHIBATO J; LEE MC; MATSUI T; RAKWAL R; SOYA H, "Long-term mild, rather than intense, exercise enhances adult hippocampal neurogenesis and greatly changes the transcriptomic profile of the hippocampus", PLoS One, (20150000), vol. 10, page e0133089
    - POP V; HEAD E; HILL MA; GILLEN D; BERCHTOLD NC; MUGGENBURG BA; MILGRAM NW; MURPHY MP; COTMAN CW, "Synergistic effects of long-term antioxidant diet and behavioral enrichment on beta-amyloid load and non-amyloidogenic processing in aged canines", J Neurosci, (20100000), vol. 30, pages 9831 - 9839
    - HIRANO M; RAKWAL R; SHIBATO J; SAWA H; NAGASHIMA K; OGAWA Y; YOSHIDA Y; IWAHASHI H; NIKI E; MASUO Y, "Proteomics- and transcriptomics-based screening of differentially expressed proteins and genes in brain of Wig rat: a model for attention deficit hyperactivity disorder (ADHD) research", J Proteome Res, (20080000), vol. 7, pages 2471 - 2489
    - LU M; GROVE EA; MILLER RJ, "Abnormal development of the hippocampal dentate gyrus in mice lacking the CXCR4 chemokine receptor", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20020000), vol. 99, pages 7090 - 7095
    - KOLODZIEJ A; SCHULZ S; GUYON A; WU DF; PFEIFFER M; ODEMIS V; HOLLT V; STUMM R, "Tonic activation of CXC chemokine receptor 4 in immature granule cells supports neurogenesis in the adult dentate gyrus", J Neurosci, (20080000), vol. 28, pages 4488 - 4500
    - CHALASANI SH; BARIBAUD F; COUGHLAN CM; SUNSHINE MJ; LEE VM; DOMS RW; LITTMAN DR; RAPER JA, "The chemokine stromal cell-derived factor-1 promotes the survival of embryonic retinal 2003; Floridi F, Trettel F, Di Bartolomeo S, Ciotti MT, Limatola C. Signalling palthways involved in the chemotactic activity of CXCL12 in cultured rat cerebellar neurons and CHP100 neuroepithelioma cells", J Neuroimmunol, (20030000), vol. 135, pages 38 - 46
    - GARZA JC; GUO M; ZHANG W; LU XY, "Leptin increases adult hippocampal neurogenesis in vivo and in vitro", J Biol Chem, (20080000), vol. 283, pages 18238 - 18247
    - LI XL; AOU S; OOMURA Y; HORI N; FUKUNAGA K; HORI T, "Impairment of long-term potentiation and spatial memory in leptin receptor-deficient rodents", Neuroscience, (20020000), vol. 113, pages 607 - 615
    - HARVEY J, "Leptin regulation of neuronal excitability and cognitive function", Curr Opin Pharmacol, (20070000), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/j.coph.2007.10.006, pages 643 - 647, XP022371182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coph.2007.10.006
    - GUO Z; JIANG H; XU X; DUAN W; MATTSON MP, "Leptin-mediated cell survival signaling in hippocampal neurons mediated by JAK STAT3 and mitochondrial stabilization", J Biol Chem, (20080000), vol. 283, pages 1754 - 1763
    - LAMMERS R; GRAY A; SCHLESSINGER J; ULLRICH A, "Differential signalling potential of insulin-and IGF-1-receptor cytoplasmic domains", EMBO J, (19890000), vol. 8, pages 1369 - 1375
    - TREJO JL; CARRO E; TORRES-ALEMAN I, "Circulating insulin-like growth factor I mediates exercise-induced increases in the number of new neurons in the adult hippocampus", J Neurosci, (20010000), vol. 21, pages 1628 - 1634
    - SONNTAG WE; RAMSEY M; CARTER CS, "Growth hormone and insulin-like growth factor-1 (IGF-1) and their influence on cognitive aging", Ageing Res Rev, (20050000), vol. 4, pages 195 - 212