Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470841

EP3470841 - IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY TEST PIECE AND SPECIMEN ADDING DEVICE FOR EXTRACTING AND MEASURING SUGAR CHAIN ANTIGEN, AND IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Denka Seiken Co., Ltd.
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KATO, Daisuke
c/o Kagamida Factory
Denka Seiken Co. Ltd.
1359-1 Aza Kagamida
Kigoshi
Gosen-shi Niigata 959-1695 / JP
02 / HATTORI, Tomohiro
c/o Kagamida Factory
Denka Seiken Co. Ltd.
1359-1 Aza Kagamida
Kigoshi
Gosen-shi Niigata 959-1695 / JP
03 / MURAMATSU, Shino
c/o Kagamida Factory
Denka Seiken Co. Ltd.
1359-1 Aza Kagamida
Kigoshi
Gosen-shi Niigata 959-1695 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Kordel, Mattias , et al
Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810400.608.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP21339
Priority number, dateJP2016011569709.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016115697
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213227
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470841
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, G01N1/10, G01N33/53, G01N33/531, G01N33/569
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:IMMUNCHROMATOGRAFIETESTSTÜCK UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HINZUFÜGEN VON PROBEN ZUR EXTRAKTION UND MESSUNG VON ZUCKERKETTENANTIGEN UND IMMUNCHROMATOGRAFISCHES VERFAHREN DAMIT[2019/16]
English:IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY TEST PIECE AND SPECIMEN ADDING DEVICE FOR EXTRACTING AND MEASURING SUGAR CHAIN ANTIGEN, AND IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY METHOD USING SAME[2019/16]
French:ÉPROUVETTE IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIQUE POUR EXTRAIRE ET MESURER UN ANTIGÈNE D'HYDRATE DE CARBONE, DISPOSITIF POUR AJOUTER UN ANALYTE ET PROCÉDÉ IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIQUE METTANT EN OEUVRE CETTE ÉPROUVETTE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]JP2015034719  (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND) [X] 1, 4-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0081] to [0095]; fig. 1 & US 2016/0370368 A1 claims; paragraphs [0163] to [0194]; fig. 1 & WO 2015/020210 A1 & EP 3032260 A1 * [Y] 2, 7, 10 [A] 3, 8-9;
 [Y]JP2014232064  (FUJIKURA KASEI KK) [Y] 2, 7, 10 * , claims; paragraph [0043]; fig. 3, 9 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2003215126  (TOKUYAMA CORP, et al) [Y] 2, 7, 10 * , claims (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP3166728U  (Areru Switzerland GmbH) [Y] 2, 7, 10 * , claims; paragraphs [0049] to [0054]; fig. 1 & US 2011/0008909 A1 claims; paragraphs [0059] to [0064]; fig. 1 & WO 2009/044167 A1 & CN 101861207 A *;
 [XA]JP2008224543  (TOKUYAMA DENTAL CORP) [X] 7, 9-10 * , claim 3; paragraphs [0065] to [0073]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 1-6, 8;
 [A]US2005277163  (CHENG SHU-CHING [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * , claims; figures & WO 1999/005524 A1 *
by applicantWO2005121794
 JP2008509384
 JP2016115697