Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469954

EP3469954 - LOAD SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR CHAIR, LOAD SUPPORT BODY FOR CHAIR, AND CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Okamura Corporation
7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MASUNAGA, Hiroshi
c/o Okamura Corporation
7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP
02 / IZAWA Syouichi
c/o Okamura Corporation
7-18 Kitasaiwai 2-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810402.208.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP21341
Priority number, dateJP2016011627310.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016116273
JP2016011627410.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016116274
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213229
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469954
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47C7/32, A47C7/40
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:LASTTRAGENDE STRUKTUR FÜR EINEN STUHL, LASTTRÄGERKÖRPER FÜR EINEN STUHL UND STUHL[2019/16]
English:LOAD SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR CHAIR, LOAD SUPPORT BODY FOR CHAIR, AND CHAIR[2019/16]
French:STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT DE CHARGE POUR CHAISE, CORPS DE SUPPORT DE CHARGE POUR CHAISE, ET CHAISE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018Translation filed 
14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Search fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]US7270378  (WILKERSON LARRY A [US], et al) [X] 1, 4-9, 11-12, 15 * , column 2, line 61 to column 6, line 2; fig. 1 to 11 & US 2006/0138849 A1 & US 2003/0168901 A1 & US 2003/0080595 A1 & US 2005/0258678 A1 * [Y] 2-3, 6, 13-15 [A] 10;
 [XYA]WO2016023128  (CASSADAY TERRY [CA]) [X] 7-9, 15 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0016]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2017/0127839 A1 & EP 3179886 A1 & CA 2960301 A1 * [Y] 10, 13-15 [A] 1-6, 11-12;
 [Y]JP2002172036  (ITOKI CREBIO CORP) [Y] 2-3, 6, 13-15 * , paragraph [0064]; fig. 1, 11 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2003000400  (ITOKI CREBIO CORP) [Y] 10, 15 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0019]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2016116273
 JP2016116274
 JP4061160B
 JP2014079510