blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469954 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469954



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 219
26.09.2019 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
09.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 17
14.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.12.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
14.12.2018 Description Search / examination 48
14.12.2018 Drawings Search / examination 14
14.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
14.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 4
14.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 49