blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3469954 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780035026 EP17810402



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019307250Global Dossier 10.10.2019A1
Priority number Date
JP2016116274 10.06.2016
JP2016116273 10.06.2016
WO2017JP21341 08.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017217376Global Dossier 14.12.2017A
Priority number Date
JP2016116274 10.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017217375Global Dossier 14.12.2017A
Priority number Date
JP2016116273 10.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109310208Global Dossier 05.02.2019A
Priority number Date
JP2016116274 10.06.2016
JP2016116273 10.06.2016
WO2017JP21341 08.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3469954Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
JP2016116274 10.06.2016
JP2016116273 10.06.2016
WO2017JP21341 08.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017213229Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
JP2016116274 10.06.2016
JP2016116273 10.06.2016