Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470439

EP3470439 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR AQUEOUS RESIN DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HARADA Akira
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
02 / HARAGUCHI Shinsuke
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
03 / TANAKA Motomi
c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810423.809.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP21462
Priority number, dateJP2016011515109.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016115151
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213250
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470439
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/24, C08F255/00, C09D5/00, C09D123/00, C09D171/00, C09D201/00
[2019/27]
Former International [2019/16]C08F2/24, C08F255/00, C09D5/00, C09D7/12, C09D123/00, C09D171/00, C09D201/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR WÄSSRIGE HARZDISPERSION[2019/16]
English:PRODUCTION METHOD FOR AQUEOUS RESIN DISPERSION[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPERSION DE RÉSINE AQUEUSE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018Translation filed 
18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2030999  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * examples 1-6; claims 1-17; table 1 * [I] 1-6
International search[X]JP2011508006  (Eastman Chemical Co.) [X] 1-3, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0005], [0026] & US 2009/0163635 A1 claims; paragraphs [0005], [0030] & WO 2009/078922 A1 & EP 2231732 A1 & KR 10-2010-0105682 A & CN 101998969 A *;
 [X]JP2009074047  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0028], [0040]; example 1 & US 2009/0061247 A1 claims; paragraphs [0033], [0034], [0046]; example 1 & EP 2030999 A1 & CN 101376684 A *;
 [X]JP2008163130  (JSR CORP) [X] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0039], [0060], [0063] (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2005060485  (MITSUI TAKEDA CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0034], [0040] (Family: none) *;
 [X]WO2004101679  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [X] 1, 4, 6 * , claims; page 27; example 36 & US 2007/0245929 A1 claims; paragraphs [0196], [0197]; example 36 & EP 1632532 A1 & KR 10-2006-0015594 A & CN 1788049 A *;
 [X]JP2005272621  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-4 * , claims; paragraph [0019] (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2010001334  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-4, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0087], [0092], [0107], [0110] (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2000264933  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-4, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0030], [0064], [0071], [0074]; example 2 (Family: none) *;
 [X]JPH09157314  (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0011], [0017]; example 4 (Family: none) *;
 [X]JPS57137339  (ASAHI DOW LTD) [X] 1-4, 6 * , claim 3; page 1, lower right column; example 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0873600  (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , claims (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS5144146  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-6 * , claims (Family: none) *