Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470555

EP3470555 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Air Water Inc.
2, Kita 3-jo Nishi 1-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi
Hokkaido 060-0003 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / OKU, Hidehiko
c/o AIR WATER INC.
2290-1 Toyoshinatakibe
Azumino-shi Nagano 399-8204 / JP
02 / HIDE, Ichiro
c/o AIR WATER INC.
2290-1 Toyoshinatakibe
Azumino-shi Nagano 399-8204 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810436.009.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP21545
Priority number, dateJP2016011607110.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016116071
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213264
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470555
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C30B29/36, C23C16/42, C30B25/18, H01L21/205, H01L21/306
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTRAT[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUBSTRATE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN SUBSTRAT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018Translation filed 
11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Search fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]JP2015202990  (AIR WATER INC) [X] 1, 11 * , claims; paragraphs [0045] to [0047], [0061]; fig. 1, 3, 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-4, 9, 10 [A] 5-8;
 [Y]JPH11329960  (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 2-4 * , claims; paragraphs [0002], [0003], [0021], [0038] & US 2001/0014536 A1 claims; paragraphs [0002], [0003], [0006], [0099], [0155] & US 6265323 B1 *;
 [Y]JP2012119655  (UNIV TOHOKU) [Y] 2, 4, 10 * , claims & US 2013/0244442 A1 claims; paragraph [0002] & US 2013/0320477 A1 & WO 2012/063425 A1 & KR 10-2013-0123404 A & CN 103210477 A & KR 10-2013-0100331 A *;
 [Y]JPH09310170  (HOYA CORP) [Y] 9, 10 * , paragraphs [0010], [0015] to [0024]; fig. 2, 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH06216050  (C S HARUPURAITAA & ZORAARUTEKU) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5471946 A & EP 594030 A3 & DE 4234508 A1 *;
 [A]JP2002025916  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
by applicantJPH09310170
 JPH07118854
 JP2015202990