Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471116

EP3471116 - COMPLEX ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moda-Innochips Co., Ltd.
42-7 Dongsan-ro 27beon-gil
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 15433 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Gyeong Tae
1008-705 76 Choji 1-ro
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15454 / KR
02 / KIM, Sang Hyun
103-601 64-5 Beorwon-Gil
Gwangju-Si Gyeonggi-do 12751 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810501.101.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR05727
Priority number, dateKR2016007255710.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160072557
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213378
Date:14.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471116
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/34, H01F27/28, H01F27/29, H01F27/32, H01F17/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KOMPLEXE ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTE[2019/16]
English:COMPLEX ELECTRONIC COMPONENT[2019/16]
French:COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPLEXE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2018Translation filed 
05.11.2018National basic fee paid 
05.11.2018Search fee paid 
05.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2008003864  (HATAKEYAMA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0016], [0022]-[0023], [0032]-[0035], [0045] and figures 1.5. *;
 [Y]KR20130047572  (TDK CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0042], [0057], [0068] and figure 3. *;
 [Y]US2015310994  (YOSUI KUNIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 9-12 * Seeparagraphs [0062]-[0073]-[0127]-[0132] and figures 1A-1B,9A-9B,11B *;
 [A]KR20160010981  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0055] and figures 6-8. *;
 [A]JP2004282139  (OTOWA ELECTRIC) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0026] and figures 1-3. *;
 [A]US2010045418  (NISHIKAWA YOSHIE [HK], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0062] and figures 1-4. *