Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470759

EP3470759 - SMART HOME CONTROLLER REFRIGERATOR AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Sang Oh
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
51 Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 08592 / KR
02 / YUN, Junsang
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
51 Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 08592 / KR
03 / MIN, Dul Lae
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
51 Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 08592 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810541.707.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR05914
Priority number, dateKR2016007185309.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160071853
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213418
Date:14.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470759
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F25D29/00, F25D19/00, F25D27/00, H04L12/28
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KÜHLSCHRANK MIT SMART-HOME-STEUERGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:SMART HOME CONTROLLER REFRIGERATOR AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR[2019/16]
French:RÉFRIGÉRATEUR À DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE DOMICILE INTELLIGENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase31.12.2018Translation filed 
31.12.2018National basic fee paid 
31.12.2018Search fee paid 
31.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
31.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]KR20020045057  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [X] 1-3, 7-15 * See abstract, page 2, line 32-page 3, line 44, claims I, 2 and figures 1, 2. * [Y] 4-6;
 [Y]KR20150016428  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [Y] 4-6 * See claims 1, 5 and figure 2. *;
 [A]KR20020030222  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *;
 [A]KR20020020831  (TOSHIBA K.K.) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1, 2 and figure 1. *;
 [A]KR20080035098  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0048] and figure 2. *