Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469088

EP3469088 - BIOCATALYSTS AND METHODS FOR HYDROXYLATION OF CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
15.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Codexis, Inc.
200 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NAZOR, Jovana
200 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City California 94063 / US
02 / OSBORNE, Robert
12505 Stonemill Way
Raleigh North Carolina 27614 / US
03 / LIANG, Jack
200 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City California 94063 / US
04 / VROOM, Jonathan
200 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City California 94063 / US
05 / ZHANG, Xiyun
34279 Maybird Circle
Fremont California 94555 / US
06 / ENTWISTLE, David
200 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City California 94063 / US
07 / VOLADRI, Rama
200 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City California 94063 / US
08 / GARCIA, Ravi, David
200 Penobscot Drive
Redwood City California 94063 / US
09 / MOORE, Jeffrey, C.
367 Orenda Circle
Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US
10 / GROSSER, Shane
249 Fisher Place
Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US
11 / KOSJEK, Birgit
680 Summit Avenue
Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US
12 / TRUPPO, Matthew
49 Hillside Terrace
Ocean Township New Jersey 07712 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Chapman, Desmond Mark
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810674.619.04.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US28370
Priority number, dateUS201662347724P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347724 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213758
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469088
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12P17/12, C12P13/24
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BIOKATALYSATOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HYDROXYLIERUNG VON CHEMISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN[2019/16]
English:BIOCATALYSTS AND METHODS FOR HYDROXYLATION OF CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS[2019/16]
French:BIOCATALYSEURS ET PROCÉDÉS D'HYDROXYLATION DE COMPOSÉS CHIMIQUES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Search fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2015118719  (CHEN HAIBIN [CN], et al) [X] 1-8 * para [0008]; [0009]; [0014]; [0018]; [0154]-[0155]; SEQ ID NOs: 2, 210. *;
 [A]CN105177026  (HEBEI NORMAL UNIVERSITY) [A] 1-8 * entire document, especially abstract. *