Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466147

EP3466147 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR BAND PAUSE TESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel IP Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BADIC, Biljana
Ottilienstr. 12
81825 München / DE
02 / MUECK, Markus Dominik
Jaegerstrasse 4b
82008 Unterhaching / DE
03 / JECHOUX, Bruno
230 chemin des vieux brusquets
06600 Antibes / FR
04 / NIU, Huaning
1308 Knollview Drive
Milpitas, CA95035 / US
05 / YANG, Chunyuan
Rabenweg 1
85570 Markt Schwaben / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17810675.320.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US28542
Priority number, dateUS201662346159P06.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662346159 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213759
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466147
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/04, H04W24/06, H04W74/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR BANDPAUSENPRÜFUNG[2019/15]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR BAND PAUSE TESTING[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TEST PENDANT UNE PAUSE DANS UNE BANDE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2018National basic fee paid 
02.11.2018Search fee paid 
02.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015110012  (BHUSHAN NAGA [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0148]-[0153]; and claims 1, 19. *;
 [A]WO2016035943  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraph [79]; and claim 1. *;
 [A]US2015043478  (MACKENZIE RICHARD THOMAS [GB]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0061]; claim 1; and figure 7. *;
 [A]US2012270595  (YANG XUE [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0046]; and claim 1. *;
 [A]  - XIAOFEI WANG et al., "TXOP Truncation Enhancement", IEEE 802.11-16/0029r0, (20160118), URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/documents?is_dcn=0029&is_year=2016, XP068104777 [A] 1-25 * See sliders 7-8. *