Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469334

EP3469334 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS USING FTIR FOR PLANT TRAIT DETECTION AND TRAIT INTROGRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Agrosciences LLC
9330 Zionsville Road
Zionsville, Indiana 46268 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PUDOTA, Bala Bhaskar
9330 Zionsville Road
Indianapolis IN 46268 / US
02 / GACHOTTE, Daniel
9330 Zionsville Road
Indianapolis IN 46268 / US
03 / STOLTZ, Virginia
9330 Zionsville Road
Indianapolis IN 46268 / US
04 / WALSH, Terence A.
9330 Zionsville Road
Indianapolis IN 46268 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)f & e patent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810693.622.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US33766
Priority number, dateUS201662347728P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347728 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213830
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469334
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N3/44, G01N21/01
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME MIT FTIR ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PFLANZENMERKMALEN UND MERKMALSINTROGRESSION[2019/16]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS USING FTIR FOR PLANT TRAIT DETECTION AND TRAIT INTROGRESSION[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES UTILISANT LA FTIR POUR LA DÉTECTION DE CARACTÈRE DE PLANTE ET L'INTROGRESSION DE CARACTÈRE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2018National basic fee paid 
04.12.2018Search fee paid 
04.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005250213  (Azizian) [Y] 1-25 * Abstrcat, para [0042], para [0017], para [0061], para [0065], para [0066], tables 1-4, figure 1 and entire document *;
 [Y]US2014203176  (Annangudi Palani et al.) [Y] 1-20, 25 * Abstract; para [00115], para [0058], para [0068], para [0040], para [00125] and entire document *;
 [Y]US2014359900  (Walsh et al.) [Y] 21-24 * Abstract, para [0011], para [0012], para [0019], para [00162], para [0021], para [0011] and entire document *;
 [Y]US2005250212  (Azizian) [Y] 1-25 * Abstrcat, para [[0025]-[0040] *
 [Y]  - AZIZIAN et al., "Quantification of trans fatty acids in food products by GC, ATR-FTIR and FT-NIR methods", Lipid tech., (20041000), vol. 16, no. 10, pages 229 - 231, XP003013510 [Y] 1-25 * , Abstract, and full document *