Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468670

EP3468670 - METHODS OF INDUCING WEIGHT LOSS, TREATING OBESITY AND PREVENTING WEIGHT GAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gelesis LLC
501 Boylston Street
Suite 6102
Boston, MA 02116 / US
For all designated states
University of Copenhagen
Nørregade 10
1165 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ASTRUP, Arne
Fabritius Alle 4
2930 Klampenborg / DK
02 / RITZ, Christian
Skraningen 8
2700 Bronshoj / DK
03 / HJORTH, Mads, Fiil
Gronlunds Alle
2610 Rodovre / DK
04 / ZOHAR, Yishai
29 Sargent Beechwood
Brookline MA 02445 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Coles, Andrea Birgit , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810748.801.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US35537
Priority number, dateDK2016000041910.06.2016         Original published format: DK 20160419
US201662357441P01.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662357441 P
US201662403946P04.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662403946 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213961
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468670
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61P3/00, A61K36/899
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERBEIFÜHRUNG VON GEWICHTSVERLUST, ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ADIPOSITAS UND VORBEUGUNG VON GEWICHTSZUNAHME[2019/16]
English:METHODS OF INDUCING WEIGHT LOSS, TREATING OBESITY AND PREVENTING WEIGHT GAIN[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'INDUCTION DE PERTE DE POIDS, DE TRAITEMENT DE L'OBÉSITÉ ET DE PRÉVENTION DE LA PRISE DE POIDS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2013079612  (HUNT SHERI A [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 6-8, 11-13, 16-18. 27 -29, 56-57, 61/(56), 62/(56), 64 * ; para [0002], [0004]-[0009], [0012], [0108]; Table 1 * [Y] 23-24, 26, 58-60, 61/(58), 62/(58), 63;
 [XY]US2014052722  (BERTSIMAS DIMITRIS J [US], et al) [X] 22 * ; abstract; para [0103], [0122]; claim 25 * [Y] 23-24, 26;
 [X]US2015366898  (HESHMATI HASSAN [US], et al) [X] 65 * ; para [0020], [0029], [0037] *;
 [Y]US2008275728  (ORDOVAS JOSE M [US]) [Y] 58-60, 61/(58), 62/(58), 63/(58) * ; abstract; para [0017], [0041]; claim 9 *;
 [Y]US2003007996  (GRAHAM TERRY E [CA], et al) [Y] 63 * ; abstract; para [0077] *;
 [A]US2008193603  (HAYES KENNETH C [US], et al) [A] 63 * ; para [0153] *;
 [A]  - "Nordic race", wikipedia, (20160523), page 1/18, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Nordic_race, (20170802), XP055449321 [A] 62
 [A]  - "Hyperglycemia", wikipedia, (20160527), page 1/5, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Hyperglycemia, (20170802), XP055449324 [A] 65
 [A]  - GREENBERG, "Glycemic Load and Glycemic Index: What's the Difference and Why Does it Matter?", HuffPost, (20110829), page 3/6, URL: http://www.huffingtonpost.com/riva-greenberg/gl-and-gi_b_863126.html, (20170802), XP055449331 [A] 26