EP3464170 - NANOPARTICLE TRANSDUCER SENSORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Washington 4545 Roosevelt Way NE Suite 400 Seattle, Washington 98105 / US | For all designated states Lamprogen, Inc. Fluke Hall Box 352141 4000 Mason Road Suite 300 Seattle, WA 98195 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIU, Daniel, T. 4545 Roosevelt Way Northeast Suite 400 Seattle WA 98105 / US | 02 /
YU, Jiangbo 4545 Roosevelt Way Northeast Suite 400 Seattle WA 98105 / US | 03 /
WU, Changfeng 2255 Qianjin Street Changchun 130012 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Kai 2699 Qianjin Street Changchun 130012 / CN | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/37] |
Former [2019/15] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17810793.4 | 05.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35983 | Priority number, date | WO2016CN84986 | 06.06.2016 Original published format: PCT/CN2016/084986 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017214047 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464170 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464170 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y15/00, C09K11/06, C09K11/07, G01N21/62, G01N21/64, G01N21/63 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
C09K11/07 (US);
G01N21/64 (US);
B82Y15/00 (US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOPARTIKELWANDLERSENSOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/15] | English: | NANOPARTICLE TRANSDUCER SENSORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2019/15] | French: | CAPTEURS À TRANSDUCTEUR À NANOPARTICULES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 27.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | AT | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | ES | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | NL | 14.09.2022 | PL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | IE | 05.06.2023 | LU | 05.06.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
LU | 05.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1496126 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008146966 (UNIV NAT CHONNAM IND FOUND [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, line 19 - page 7, line 22; figure 1; examples 1,2,4; claims 1-13 *; | [Y]EP2944605 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALI [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0021]; claims 1-15 *; | [A] - MAXWELL B. ZEIGLER ET AL, "Hybrid Semiconducting Polymer Nanoparticles as Polarization-Sensitive Fluorescent Probes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20130807), vol. 135, no. 31, doi:10.1021/ja404719f, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 11453 - 11456, XP055088462 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja404719f | [XP] - KAI SUN ET AL, "In Vivo Dynamic Monitoring of Small Molecules with Implantable Polymer-Dot Transducer", ACS NANO, US, (20160620), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1021/acsnano.6b02386, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 6769 - 6781, XP055622432 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsnano.6b02386 | International search | [Y]US2013266957 (CHIU DANIEL T [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 3/1-2 * ; figure 1a; paragraphs [0007]-[0010], [0060]-[0063] *; | [Y] - BROWN, JQ et al., "Encapsulation of glucose oxidase and an oxygen-quenched fluorophore in polyelectrolyte-coated calcium alginate microspheres as optical glucose sensor systems", Biosensors and Bioelectronics, (20050715), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 212 - 216, XP027619457 [Y] 1-2, 3/1-2 | by applicant | US2013266957 | WO2010US56079 | WO2011US56768 | WO2012US71767 | WO2013US24300 | WO2013US63917 |