Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463233

EP3463233 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING COMPRESSION WITH COMPRESSION BANDAGES HAVING STRETCHABLE ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
23.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elwha LLC
3150 139th Avenue SE
Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DUESTERHOFT, Paul
1253 Canyon Lake
Grapevine Texas 76051 / US
02 / HYDE, Roderick A.
9915 161st Ave NE
Redmond Washington 98052 / US
03 / MCKNIGHT, Gary L.
8548 NE 176th St.
Bothell Washington 98011 / US
04 / SWEENEY, Elizabeth A.
702 N. 143rd Street
Seattle Washington 98133 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17810822.106.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US36072
Priority number, dateUS20161517426906.06.2016         Original published format: US201615174269
US20161517428506.06.2016         Original published format: US201615174285
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214090
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463233
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/08, A61F13/06, A61B5/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER KOMPRESSION MIT KOMPRESSIONSBANDAGEN MIT DEHNBARER ELEKTRONIK[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING COMPRESSION WITH COMPRESSION BANDAGES HAVING STRETCHABLE ELECTRONICS[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA COMPRESSION À L'AIDE DE BANDAGES DE COMPRESSION À ÉLÉMENTS ÉLECTRONIQUES ÉTIRABLES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYA]US2010231377  (SANDHOLDT, CARSTEN) [X] 1, 12-16, 21 * See paragraphs [0008]-[0070]; claims 1-24; figures 1, 7, 19a-19c. * [Y] 2-11, 17-20, 22, 24 [A] 23;
 [Y]US2016120734  (ELWHA LLC) [Y] 2-11, 17-20, 22, 24 * See paragraphs [0052]-[0123]; claim 66; figures 1A-5. *;
 [A]US8025632  (EINARSSON, PALMI) [A] 1-24 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]WO03060449  (TECHNOSKIN, LLC) [A] 1-24 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]US6135116  (VOGEL, RICHARD C. et al.) [A] 1-24 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]WO2005067796  (RUFER, MICHAEL et al.) [A] 1-24 * See the whole document. *