Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464311

EP3464311 - SEMI-BIOSYNTHETIC PRODUCTION OF FATTY ALCOHOLS AND FATTY ALDEHYDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Provivi, Inc.
1701 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, California 90404 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / OTTE, Konrad
c/o PROVIVI Inc.
1701 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, California 90404 / US
02 / SHEPPARD, Micah
c/o PROVIVI Inc.
1701 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, California 90404 / US
03 / BUI, Vu
c/o PROVIVI Inc.
1701 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, California 90404 / US
04 / WAMPLER, Keith
c/o PROVIVI Inc.
1701 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, California 90404 / US
05 / LEONARD, Effendi
c/o PROVIVI Inc.
1701 Colorado Avenue
Santa Monica, California 90404 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17810850.206.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US36136
Priority number, dateUS201662346335P06.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662346335 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017214133
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3464311
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07H21/00, C07H21/04, C08G63/48
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HALB-BIOSYNTHETISCHE HERSTELLUNG VON FETTALKOHOLEN UND FETTALDEHYDEN[2019/15]
English:SEMI-BIOSYNTHETIC PRODUCTION OF FATTY ALCOHOLS AND FATTY ALDEHYDES[2019/15]
French:PRODUCTION SEMI-BIOSYNTHÉTIQUE D'ALCOOLS GRAS ET D'ALDÉHYDES GRAS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase31.12.2018National basic fee paid 
31.12.2018Search fee paid 
31.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
31.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
04.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2016046914  (HOM LOUIS [US], et al) [X] 1, 5/1 * para [0049]; [0066]; [0102]; [0108]; [0256]-[0258]; [0276]; [0331]-[0340]; [0358]. * [Y] 2-4, 5/(2,3);
 [Y]US2015166465  (CHEN JIANXIN [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3, 4/(2,3), 5/(2,3) * para [0520]. *;
 [Y]US2016076058  (FRIEDMAN LISA [US], et al) [Y] 4 * claims 48-75. *