Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469089

EP3469089 - EUGLENA LYSATE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE COMPOSITION AND A PURIFIED BETA-1,3-GLUCAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F3 Platform Biologics, Inc.
1200 Ashwood Parkway 150
Atlanta, GA 30338 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / COX, Brad
15321 Ackerley Drive
Fishers, Indiana 46040 / US
02 / JAMROG, Derek
5841 Kingsley Drive
Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US
03 / ZURCHER, Kip
14502 Cotswold Lane
Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Ferreccio, Rinaldo
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810911.207.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36270
Priority number, dateUS20161517736809.06.2016         Original published format: US201615177368
US20161517737609.06.2016         Original published format: US201615177376
US20161517738309.06.2016         Original published format: US201615177383
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214224
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469089
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12P19/04, C08B37/00, A23L33/10, A23L33/125, C12P1/00, A23L33/105, A23L33/12, A23L33/15, A23L33/175, A23L33/16
[2019/19]
Former International [2019/16]C12P19/04, C08B37/00, A23L33/10, A23L33/125
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:EUGLENA-LYSAT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND GEREINIGTES BETA-1,3-GLUCAN[2019/16]
English:EUGLENA LYSATE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE COMPOSITION AND A PURIFIED BETA-1,3-GLUCAN[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITION DE LYSAT D'EUGLENA ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LA COMPOSITION D ET D'UN BÊTA-1,3-GLYCANE PURIFIÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Search fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
06.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013216586  (LEBRUN JEFFREY RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11,13,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0147]; figure -; table - * [I] 3,8,12,14;
 [XAI]US2014287919  (LEVINE ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11,13,15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0088]; table - * [A] 3,6,7 [I] 8,12,14;
 [XI]EP0409488  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7,10,11,13,15 * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 51; example 1; table 1 * [I] 2-6,8,9,12,14;
 [XI]US2013303752  (LEVINE ROBERT BERNARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0090]; tables 1-2 * [I] 3,9-15;
 [A]US2009017147  (LINTNER KARL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0384] - paragraph [0392] *;
 [A]US2016122789  (WATANABE MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0121] *
International search[X]US2013303752  (LEVINE ROBERT BERNARD [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * See table 1; paragraphs [0034]-[0035],[0057]-[0061], [0065], [0073]-[0074] and [0080]. *;
 [X]KR20010102053  (DR. SUWELACK SKIN & HEALTH CARE AG) [X] 15, 17, 26-28 * See page 15, paragraphs 2-3. *;
 [X]US8741357  (LINTNER KARL [FR], et al) [X] 15, 17 * See claim 1. *;
 [X]  - MONFILS, ANNA K. et al., "Characterization of paramylon morphological diversity in photosynthetic euglenoids(Euglenales, Euglenophyta", Phycologia, (20110303), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 156 - 169, XP055456924 [X] 15, 17 * See "MATERIAL AND METHODS" section. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2216/09-112.1
 [A]  - VAN DER MERWE , LAURIANNE, "UDP-Glucose: beta-(1-3)-glucan (paramylon) synthase from Euglena gracilis", Thesis (Magister Scientiae (Plant Biotechnology, (20070000), vol. 12, XP055456927 [A] 1-37 * , internal pages 1-70 See abstract. *