Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468655

EP3468655 - RADIO FREQUINCY NEEDLING DEVICE FOR USE WITH DISPOSABLE NEEDLE CARTRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eclipse Medcorp, LLC
5916 Stone Creek Dr., Suite 120
The Colony, TX 75056 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / O'BRIEN III, Thomas, Michael
14885 Lake Forest Drive
Dallas, TX 75254 / US
02 / TEPPER, John
2101 Le Mans Drive
Carrollton, TX 75006 / US
03 / GARRETT, Jeffrey
1209 Marble Falls Court
Allen, TX 75013 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)McQueen, Andrew Peter
Miltons IP - Europe
5th Floor, Broad Quay House
Prince Street
Bristol BS1 4DJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810931.007.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36335
Priority number, dateUS20161517622308.06.2016         Original published format: US201615176223
US20161535607918.11.2016         Original published format: US201615356079
US20171549556424.04.2017         Original published format: US201715495564
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214264
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468655
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M37/00, A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61B90/00, A61M5/315, A61M5/20, A61M5/32, A61M5/46
[2019/31]
Former International [2019/16]A61M37/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HOCHFREQUENZNADELUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINWEGNADELKARTUSCHEN[2019/16]
English:RADIO FREQUINCY NEEDLING DEVICE FOR USE WITH DISPOSABLE NEEDLE CARTRIDGES[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PUNCTURE À RADIOFRÉQUENCE POUR UTILISATION AVEC DES CARTOUCHES À AIGUILLE JETABLES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015088050  (Chang, F.; et. al.) [A] 1, 17 * ; entire text *;
 [A]US2012041374  (Lee, J.) [A] 1, 17 * ; entire text *;
 [A]US2014066864  (U-BioMed, Inc.) [A] 1, 17 * ; entire text *