Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468655 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468655



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 387
04.11.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
15.10.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.10.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 10
15.10.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.10.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 6
05.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
05.09.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.08.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
28.06.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.06.2019 Partial European search report Search / examination 6
28.06.2019 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 9
31.05.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
07.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
07.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
07.01.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
07.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.06.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 92
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 57
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 75