Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463366

EP3463366 - TOPICAL FORMULATIONS OF PDE-4 INHIBITORS AND THEIR METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dermavant Sciences GmbH
Viaduktstrasse 8
4051 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd.
4-6-10 Koishikawa Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112-8088 / JP
For all designated states
Vyas, Ambrish
107 King James Court
Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US
For all designated states
Takemoto, Seiji
1 Kawashimatakehaya-machi
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 501-6195 / JP
For all designated states
Akimoto, Yoshihiro
1 Kawashimatakehaya-machi
Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu 501-6195 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / VYAS, Ambrish
c/o Eisai Co. Ltd. Kawashima Industrial Complex
1 Kawashimatakehaya-machi
Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 501-6195 / JP
02 / TAKEMOTO, Seiji
c/o Eisai Co. Ltd. Kawashima Industrial Complex
1 Kawashimatakehaya-machi
Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 501-6195 / JP
03 / AKIMOTO, Yoshihiro
c/o Eisai Co. Ltd. Kawashima Industrial Complex
1 Kawashimatakehaya-machi
Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 501-6195 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)AWA Denmark A/S
Strandgade 56
1401 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17810947.607.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US36381
Priority number, dateUS201662347006P07.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347006 P
US201762449753P24.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762449753 P
US201762488495P21.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762488495 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214289
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463366
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/517, C07D239/72, A61P17/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:TOPISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN VON PDE-4-INHIBITOREN UND DEREN VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[2019/15]
English:TOPICAL FORMULATIONS OF PDE-4 INHIBITORS AND THEIR METHODS OF USE[2019/15]
French:FORMULATIONS TOPIQUES D'INHIBITEURS DE PDE-4 ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2018National basic fee paid 
11.12.2018Search fee paid 
11.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2011021545  (KIMURA CHIHARU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-24 * para [0009]-[0011], [0066] -[0072], [0081], [0092] *;
 [Y]WO2006085127  (ANTIBE THERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-24 * pg 10, In 22 to pg 11, In 7; pg 18, In 21 to pg 19, In 10 *;
 [A]US8530654  (YAMAMOTO EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * Entire Document *