Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468563

EP3468563 - COMPOUNDS FOR DELIVERING GLUTATHIONE TO A TARGET AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oregon State University
Office for Commercialization & Corporate
Development
A312 Kerr Administration Building
Corvallis, OR 97331-2140 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BECKMAN, Joseph, S.
Office for Commercialization & Corporate
Development
A312 Kerr Administration Building
Corvallis, OR 97331-2140 / US
02 / HAGEN, Tory, M.
Office for Commercialization & Corporate
Development
A312 Kerr Administration Building
Corvallis, OR 97331-2140 / US
03 / BEILBY, Pamela, R.
Office for Commercialization & Corporate
Development
A312 Kerr Administration Building
Corvallis, OR 97331-2140 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810952.607.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36393
Priority number, dateUS201662348030P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348030 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214297
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468563
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7088, A61K38/54, A61K45/06, A61K49/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN ZUR ABGABE VON GLUTATHION AN EIN TARGET SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/16]
English:COMPOUNDS FOR DELIVERING GLUTATHIONE TO A TARGET AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME[2019/16]
French:COMPOSÉS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE GLUTATHION À UNE CIBLE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LES PRÉPARER ET LES UTILISER[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2018National basic fee paid 
23.11.2018Search fee paid 
23.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
23.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2016129070  (South Dakota Board of Regents) [X] 1-2, 4, 23-25 * ; para[0005], para[0065], para[0075] *;
 [A]US2011305751  (Gaillard) [A] 1-2, 4, 23-25 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US2004063640  (Burg et al.) [A] 1-2, 4, 23-25 * ; entire document *
 [A]  - YANG et al., "Does Vitamin E Prevent or Promote Cancer?", Cancer Prevention Research, (20120403), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1158/1940-6207.CAPR-12-0045, pages 701 - 705, XP055459345 [A] 25 * ; Abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1940-6207.CAPR-12-0045
 [A]  - FISCHLER et al., "Chain-like assembly of gold nanoparticles on artificial DNA templates via", Chemical Communications, (20071129), pages 169 - 171, XP055459347 [A] 1 * ; p169 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B715602B