Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469023

EP3469023 - RUBBER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KAWASHIMA, Masahiro
1659 South Main Street
Akron OH 44301 / US
02 / RACKAITIS, Mindaugas
7660 Oakdale Street NW
Massillon OH 44646 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date17810998.908.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36504
Priority number, dateUS201662347388P08.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347388 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214365
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469023
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:C08L53/00, C08L9/00, C08L47/00, B60C1/00, C08F297/02, C08L7/00
[2019/48]
Former International [2019/16]C08L53/00, C08L9/00, C08L47/00, B60C1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2019/16]
English:RUBBER COMPOSITION[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Search fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US6313213  (NAKAMURA TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * claim 1 * * examples 1-7 *;
 [X]US4167544  (RAMOS ALONSO R, et al) [X] 1-15 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0761703  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-15 * examples 7,22 *;
 [X]EP2289992  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * examples 1-2 *;
 [X]JP3392258B  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * claim - *;
 [A]US4370448  (LELAND JOHN E) [A] 1-15 * claim - *
International search[A]US4370448  (LELAND JOHN E) [A] 1-20 * See column 2, lines 4-9; column 3, lines 1-4; and claim 1. *;
 [A]US2003100660  (ZANZIG DAVID JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0039]; and claim 1. *;
 [A]US6071836  (ST LAWRENCE MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; and claims 1, 21. *;
 [A]WO8401951  (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; and claim 1. *;
 [A]US2006060285  (WEYDERT MARC [LU], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0062]; and claims 1, 3. *