Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469069

EP3469069 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INCLUDING B LYMPHOCYTE CELL LINE EXPRESSING MEMBRANE IMMUNOGLOBULIN DIFFERENT FROM SECRETED IMMUNOGLOBULIN AND CYTOLYTIC FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elwha LLC
3150 139th Avenue SE
Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HYDE, Roderick A.
9915 161st Ave NE
Redmond Washington 98052 / US
02 / KINDSVOGEL, Wayne R.
6014 24th Ave NE
Seattle Washington 98115 / US
03 / MCKNIGHT, Gary L.
8548 NE 176th St.
Bothell Washington 98011 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811004.508.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36521
Priority number, dateUS20161517871510.06.2016         Original published format: US201615178715
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214376
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469069
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/0781, C12N15/85, A61K35/17, A61K35/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT B-LYMPHOZYT-ZELL-LINIE, DIE EIN UNTERSCHIEDLICHES MEMBRANIMMUNGLOBULIN ALS SEKRETIERTES IMMUNGLOBULIN EXPRIMIERT, UND ZYTOLYSEFUNKTION[2019/16]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INCLUDING B LYMPHOCYTE CELL LINE EXPRESSING MEMBRANE IMMUNOGLOBULIN DIFFERENT FROM SECRETED IMMUNOGLOBULIN AND CYTOLYTIC FUNCTION[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS COMPRENANT UNE LIGNÉE CELLULAIRE DE LYMPHOCYTES B EXPRIMANT UNE IMMUNOGLOBULINE MEMBRANAIRE DIFFÉRENTE D'UNE IMMUNOGLOBULINE SÉCRÉTÉE ET FONCTION CYTOLYTIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2015203572  (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al) [Y] 1-33 * See claims 1-11, 15-16, 19-24 and 26-35; paragraphs [0007]-[0008] and [0041], *;
 [A]WO2011050985  (BIONTECH AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-33 * See claims 1-9. *;
 [PX]US2016355783  (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al) [PX] 1-33 * See claims 1-5, 11, 15-16, 19-20 and 22-26. *
 [Y]  - HAGN, MAGDALENA et al., "Why do human B cells secrete granzyme B? Insights into a novel B- cell differentiation pathway", Oncoimmunology, (20120000), vol. 1, no. 8, pages 1368 - 1375, XP055449030 [Y] 1-33 * See abstract; figure 1. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/onci.22354
 [A]  - XU, HUI et al., "Development and characterization of anti-Gal B cell receptor transgenic Gal-/- mice", Transplantation, (20020527), vol. 73, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1097/00007890-200205270-00006, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 1549 - 1557, XP008174193 [A] 1-33 * See the whole document. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-200205270-00006