Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468791

EP3468791 - NANOFIBER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lintec Of America, Inc.
990 N. Bowser Road Suite 840
Richardson, Texas 75081 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HUYNH, Chi
c/o LINTEC OF AMERICA INC.
990 N. Bowser Road Suite 840
Richardson Texas 75081 / US
02 / ITO, Masaharu
7-7-3 Tsuji Minami-Ku
Saitama-shi
Saitama 336-0026 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811058.109.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36687
Priority number, dateUS201662348423P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348423 P
US201662349339P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349339 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214474
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468791
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:B32B15/00, B32B27/00, B32B25/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:NANOFASERFOLIE[2019/16]
English:NANOFIBER SHEET[2019/16]
French:FEUILLE DE NANOFIBRES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2018National basic fee paid 
05.11.2018Search fee paid 
05.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2016012975  (MARUYAMA SHIGEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,14 * figures 1c, 1d * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0006] * [A] 5,7 [I] 4,6,11-13,15;
 [XAI]WO2005033237  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,14 * figures 1D, 5 * [A] 5,7 [I] 6,15
International search[A]US2008318049  (HATA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; para [0191], [0192]; FIG. 22 *;
 [A]US2008014465  (FEARING RONALD S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; FIG. 1-A *;
 [A]US2007207318  (JIN SUNGHO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; para [0006], [0019]; FIG. 4B *