Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469289

EP3469289 - 3D SPIRAL HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fluid Handling LLC.
8200 N. Austin Avenue
Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LOPES, Jeffrey D.
1489 E. Evergreen Dr.
Apt. 301
Palatine Illinois 60074 / US
 [2019/22]
Former [2019/16]01 / LOPES, Jeffrey D.
1441 E. Evergreen Dr. Apt. 302
Palatine Illinois 60074 / US
Representative(s)Herrmann, Jochen
Patentanwalt
European Patent Attorney
Königstrasse 30
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811069.809.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36720
Priority number, dateUS201662347813P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347813 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214489
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469289
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F28D9/04, F28D9/00, F28D7/04, F28D7/02, F28D7/16, F28F1/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:3D-SPIRALWÄRMETAUSCHER[2019/16]
English:3D SPIRAL HEAT EXCHANGER[2019/16]
French:ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR EN SPIRALE 3D[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
19.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]CN104279895  (HEILONGJIANG JINYONG SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 6-7 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1; page 6, paragraph 5; page 6, paragraph 7; page 4, paragraph 2; * [Y] 4-5;
 [Y]WO2015067565  (BAE SYSTEMS PLC) [Y] 4-5 * , entire document, especially Fig. 2, 3; page 11, In 21-23; page 11, In 24-31; *;
 [A]US4981171  (Tippmann) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2012175095  (Makhlouf et al.) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *;
 [A]US6263961  (Antoine) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *;
 [A]WO9207226  (Koot) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2002092646  (Kuhn et al.) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2663549  (Otten) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *