Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469006

EP3469006 - PUMPABLE AND/OR FLOWABLE BIOPOLYMER SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cargill, Incorporated
15407 McGinty Road West
Mail Stop 24
Wayzata, Minnesota 55391 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MALSAM, Jeffrey J.
3109 Freemont Avenue South
Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US
02 / SUMNER, Eric Stanley
3201 Irving Avenue South
Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811072.209.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36730
Priority number, dateUS201662348278P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348278 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017214492
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3469006
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:PUMPBARE UND/ODER FLIESSFÄHIGEN BIOPOLYMERSUSPENSION[2019/16]
English:PUMPABLE AND/OR FLOWABLE BIOPOLYMER SUSPENSION[2019/16]
French:SUSPENSION DE BIOPOLYMÈRE POMPABLE ET/OU FLUIDE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]WO2016087521  (Wintershall Holding GmbH) [X] 1-7 * pg 4, In 30-32; pg 5, In 1-7; pg 10, In 7-14, 22-30; pg 13, In 36-37; pg 14, Table * [Y] 8, 10-18 [A] 9;
 [XY]WO2007003688  (Avenly Oy) [X] 37-43 * pg 4, In 13-16; pg 5, In 3-5, 2630 * [Y] 8, 16-18;
 [Y]US2007128331  (Kvist et al.) [Y] 10-12 * para [0028] *;
 [Y]US2004258829  (Zheng et al.) [Y] 13 * para [0177]; [0181] *;
 [Y]WO2013171137  (Wintershall Holding GmbH) [Y] 14-15 * pg 7, In 1115 *;
 [A]US2006040036  (Vasanthan et al.) [A] 1-18 * para [0004]; [0027][0029] *;
 [A]US4946702  (Stipp et al.) [A] 13 * col 6, In 45-48 *;
 [A]US2003153746  (Van Lengerich et al.) [A] 1-18 * whole document *
 [A]  - WEISSBERG et al., "Viscosity of Dilute and Moderately Concentrated Polymer Solutions", Journal of Research of the National EurEau of Standards, (19510000), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 298 - 314, XP055455037 [A] 37-43 * . pg 299, col 2, para 4; pg 300, col 1, para 1; pg 302, col 1, para 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.6028/jres.047.038
 [A]  - DETERMINATION OF THE GENERALLY RECOGNIZED AS SAFE (GRAS) STATUS OF MUSHROOM BETA-GLUCANS AS A FOOD INGREDIENT, (20120111), pages 8 - 23 [A] 38-40 * , specifically page 10 para 2; pg 23, para 2 *