Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469006 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469006



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 126
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.02.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
07.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.02.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
07.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.02.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
07.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
08.01.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.01.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.01.2018 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
14.12.2017 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 29