blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3469006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019135948Global Dossier 09.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016
US201716308296 09.06.2017
WO2017US36730 09.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3027105Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016
WO2017US36730 09.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3469006Global Dossier 17.04.2019A2
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016
WO2017US36730 09.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112018075572 19.03.2019A2
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016
WO2017US36730 09.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CO2019000098 29.03.2019A2
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016
WO2017US36730 09.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2018015243 11.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016
WO2017US36730 09.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017214492Global Dossier 18.01.2018A3
WO2017214492 14.12.2017A2
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR108694 19.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201662348278 10.06.2016