Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468495

EP3468495 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED DELIVERY OF EXPANDABLE CATHETER ASSEMBLIES INTO BODY LUMENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuvaira, Inc.
3750 Annapolis Lane North, Suite 105
Plymouth MN 55447 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WAHR, Dennis
c/o Nuvaira Inc.
3750 Annapolis Lane North Suite 105
Plymouth Minnesota 55447 / US
02 / WALES, Larry
c/o Nuvaira Inc.
3750 Annapolis Lane North Suite 105
Plymouth Minnesota 55447 / US
03 / MERTENS, Steven P.
c/o Nuvaira Inc.
3750 Annapolis Lane North Suite 105
Plymouth Minnesota 55447 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811089.609.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36773
Priority number, dateUS201662347980P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347980 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214516
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468495
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14, A61B1/00, A61B17/00, A61B18/00, A61B18/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN FREISETZUNG VON EXPANDIERBAREN KATHETERANORDNUNGEN IN KÖRPERLUMEN[2019/16]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED DELIVERY OF EXPANDABLE CATHETER ASSEMBLIES INTO BODY LUMENS[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION AMÉLIORÉE D'ENSEMBLES CATHÉTERS EXTENSIBLES DANS DES LUMIÈRES CORPORELLES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
24.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2014336636  (HUSZAR HILLARY K [US], et al) [X] 1, 5 * entire document * [Y] 2, 4;
 [Y]US2010191231  (HEBERER JOANN [US]) [Y] 2, 4 * entire document *;
 [A]US2013324987  (LEUNG MARK [CA], et al) [A] 1-7, 12-15, 18-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2007288001  (PATEL PANKAJ [US]) [A] 1-7, 12-15, 18-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010262140  (WATSON JASON PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 12-15, 18-20 * entire document *