Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468477

EP3468477 - COLLECTOR FOR DETECTION AND REVERSIBLE CAPTURING OF CELLS FROM BODY FLUIDS IN VIVO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haimachek, Inc.
2200 Santa Monica Blvd.
Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HOON, David, S. B.
2200 Santa Monica Blvd.
Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811109.209.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36824
Priority number, dateUS201662348103P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348103 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214550
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468477
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B10/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KOLLEKTOR ZUM NACHWEIS UND REVERSIBLEN EINFANGEN VON ZELLEN AUS KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITEN IN VIVO[2019/16]
English:COLLECTOR FOR DETECTION AND REVERSIBLE CAPTURING OF CELLS FROM BODY FLUIDS IN VIVO[2019/16]
French:COLLECTEUR DESTINÉ À LA DÉTECTION ET À LA CAPTURE RÉVERSIBLE DE CELLULES À PARTIR DE LIQUIDES CORPORELS IN VIVO[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Search fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
01.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2004054455  (PELICAN TECHNOLOGIES, INC.) [Y] 1-31 * , abstract, p. 4 lines 7-14, p. 12 lines 7-30, p. 13 lines 1-28, p. 26 lines 23-33, p. 27 lines 1-17, p. 42 lines 9-29, p. 76 lines 6-27, fig. 1, 2, 3, 4, 52, 73, 137 *;
 [Y]US2012116383  (MEDTRONIC ARDIAN LUXEMBOURG S.A.R.L.) [Y] 1-31 * , abstract, paragraphs [0098]-[0109], [0111]-[0126], [0128], [0129], [0133]-[0136], [0150]-[0153], [0168], [0183], [0187], [0190], [0195], [0200], [0204]-[0209], fig. 1, 2, 3A-C, 4A-D, 6A, 6J, 8A-D, 10A, 10B *