12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
21.07.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
17.07.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
17.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
10.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
09.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.08.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
25.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.06.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.06.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
22.01.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
26.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.06.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
26.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
26.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
17.01.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
16.08.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
16.08.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
03.08.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.03.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
15.03.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.03.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
19.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
04.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|