Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468559

EP3468559 - METHODS OF USE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATIONS OF HDAC INHIBITORS WITH BET INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dana Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.
450 Brookline Avenue
Boston, Massachusetts 02215 / US
For all designated states
Acetylon Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
70 Fargo Street, Suite 205
Boston, MA 02210 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WONG, Kwok-kin
c/o Dana-Farber Cancer Institute Inc.
450 Brookline Avenue
Boston MA 02215 / US
02 / LIU, Yan
c/o Dana-Farber Cancer Institute Inc.
450 Brookline Avenue
Boston MA 02215 / US
03 / ADEEGBE, Dennis, O.
c/o Dana-Farber Cancer Institute Inc.
450 Brookline Avenue
Boston MA 02215 / US
04 / QUAYLE, Steven, Norman
65 Linden Street 1
Brookline MA 02445 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17811118.309.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36847
Priority number, dateUS201662348054P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348054 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214565
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468559
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/505, A61K8/42
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBA18.12.2018
ME18.12.2018
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN VON HDAC-HEMMERN MIT BET-HEMMERN[2019/16]
English:METHODS OF USE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATIONS OF HDAC INHIBITORS WITH BET INHIBITORS[2019/16]
French:MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION ET COMBINAISONS PHARMACEUTIQUES D'INHIBITEURS DE HDAC AVEC DES INHIBITEURS BET[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2015168587  (ONCOETHIX SA) [X] 1-4, 10, 15-16, 18, 22, 25/15-16, 25/18, 25/22, 26/15-16, 26/18, 26/22, 28/15-16, 28/18, 28/22, 29/15-16, 29/18, 29/22 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0004], [0017], [0069], [0077], [0093], [00101], [00117]-[00118], [00179], [00194], [00241] * [Y] 5-9, 11/1-10, 12/11/1-10, 17, 19-21, 25/15, 25/17, 25/19-21, 25/23-24, 26/17, 26/19-21, 27/26/15-22, 28/17, 28/19-21, 29/15, 29/17, 29/19-21, 29/23-24, 30/17-22;
 [Y]US2015105358  (QUAYLE, SN et al) [Y] 5-6, 11/5-6, 12/11/5-6, 17, 25/17, 26/17, 27/26/17, 28/17, 29/17, 30/17 * ; claims 1, 12 *;
 [Y]US2016030458  (ACETYLON PHARMACEUTICALS INC) [Y] 7-9, 11/7-9, 12/11/7-9, 19-21, 25/19-21, 26/19-21, 27/26/19-21, 28/19-21, 29/19-21, 30/19-21 * ; abstract; paragraph [0088] *;
 [X]  - LWIN, TL et al., "A microenvironment-mediated c-Myc/miR-548m/HDAC6 amplification loop in non-Hodgkin B cell lymphomas", The Journal of Clinical Investigation, (20131100), vol. 123, no. 11, pages 4612 - 4626, XP055389682 [X] 1, 10, 11/1, 11/10, 12/11/1, 12/11/10, 15, 23-24, 26/15, 26/23-24, 28/15, 28/23-24, 30/15, 30/23-24 11/1-10,12/11/1-10, 25/15, 25/23-24, 27/26/15, 27/26/23-24, 29/15, 29/23-24, 30/15-16, 30/17-22 * ; page 4618, column 2, paragraph 3; page 4619, figure 5; page 4619, column1, paragraph 1; page 4619, column 2, paragraph 1; page 4619, figure 5D; paragraph 4621, column 2, paragraph 3; page 4622, figure 7; page 4625, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI64210
 [Y]  - DEPEW, ZS et al., "Pulmonary mantle cell lymphoma: a rare manifestation of an uncommon condition", Rare Tumors, (20120000), vol. 4, no. e11, pages 30 - 31, XP055456497 [Y] 27/26/15-24 * ; abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4081/rt.2012.e11