Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469499

EP3469499 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED ANNOTATION AND SCREENING OF BIOLOGICAL SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Twist Bioscience Corporation
455 Mission Bay Blvd. South
Suite 545
San Francisco, CA 94158 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DIGGANS, James
1324 Cordilleras Avenue
San Carlos California 94070 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811124.109.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36868
Priority number, dateUS201662348786P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348786 P
US201662375858P16.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662375858 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214574
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469499
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50, G06F19/22, G06F19/28, C12N15/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUTOMATISIERTES KOMMENTIEREN UND SCREENING VON BIOLOGISCHEN SEQUENZEN[2019/16]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED ANNOTATION AND SCREENING OF BIOLOGICAL SEQUENCES[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ANNOTATION ET DE CRIBLAGE AUTOMATISÉS DE SÉQUENCES BIOLOGIQUES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2015120265  (AMIRAV-DRORY OMRI [IL], et al) [X] 16, 18, 19, 28, 30 * entire document * [Y] 1-4, 13-15, 17, 29, 31;
 [Y]US2016096160  (BANYAI WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 13-15 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2010292102  (NOURI ALI [US]) [Y] 2, 14, 17, 31 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2009170802  (STAHLER PEER F [DE], et al) [Y] 29 * entire document *;
 [A]US2011172127  (JACOBSON JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 13-19, 28-31 * entire document *