Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468578

EP3468578 - USES OF IL-41 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZLOTNIK, Albert
4863 Drakewood Terrace
San Diego CA 92130 / US
02 / USHACH, Irina
621 Elm Avenue
San Bruno CA 94066 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811149.810.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36921
Priority number, dateUS201662348506P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348506 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214609
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468578
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61K38/19, A61K38/20, C07K14/52, C07K14/54, C07K16/18, C07K16/24, A61K39/395
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNGEN VON IL-41[2019/16]
English:USES OF IL-41[2019/16]
French:UTILISATIONS DE L'IL-41[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2018National basic fee paid 
27.12.2018Search fee paid 
27.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]  - IRINA USHACH ET AL, "METEORIN-LIKE is a cytokine associated with barrier tissues and alternatively activated macrophages", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20150201), vol. 156, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.clim.2014.11.006, ISSN 1521-6616, pages 119 - 127, XP055644816 [I] 1-12 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract, items 1, 3.1, 3.4, 3.6 and 4. and figure 4*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clim.2014.11.006
 [I]  - SI-LI ZHENG ET AL, "Metrnl: a secreted protein with new emerging functions", ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA, GB, (20160411), vol. 37, no. 5, doi:10.1038/aps.2016.9, ISSN 1671-4083, pages 571 - 579, XP055644818 [I] 1-12 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract, concluding remarks and figure 3. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/aps.2016.9
 [I]  - RAO RAJESH R ET AL, "Meteorin-like Is a Hormone that Regulates Immune-Adipose Interactions to Increase Beige Fat Thermogenesis", CELL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140605), vol. 157, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2014.03.065, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 1279 - 1291, XP028849519 [I] 1-12 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract and Discussion*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.03.065
 [T]  - IRINA USHACH ET AL, "Meteorin-like/Meteorin-[beta] Is a Novel Immunoregulatory Cytokine Associated with Inflammation", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20181121), vol. 201, no. 12, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1800435, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3669 - 3676, XP055645756 [T] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1800435
International search[Y]US2010150829  (GARCIA-MARTINEZ LEON [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * ; paragraphs [0036], [0042], [0046], [0508], [0511], [0550], [0573], [0691], [0694], [0701] *;
 [Y]US2016151459  (TARNOPOLSKY MARK [CA], et al) [Y] 1-12 * ; Paragraphs [0006], [0045], Figure 3A *;
 [Y]US2012282272  (UTKU NALAN [DE]) [Y] 3, 10 * ; paragraphs [0003], [0011] *