Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3468578


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Supplementary search report published on  01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019 Change - classification published on  01.01.2020  [2020/01]
05.12.2019 Change - classification published on  01.01.2020  [2020/01]
16.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
01.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
20.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2019 Change - representative
11.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
03.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication