Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469125

EP3469125 - WARP KNIT FABRIC FOR TEXTILE AND MEDICAL APPLICATIONS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Duke University
2812 Erwin Road
Durham, NC 27705 / US
For all designated states
North Carolina State University
Campus Box 7212
Raleigh, NC 27695 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LEVINSON, Howard
Duke University Medical Center
Dumc 3181
Durham NC 27710 / US
02 / DAVIS, James, Brian
College of Textiles 1410
Box 8301
NCSU Campus
Raleigh NC 27695 / US
03 / WARD, Don
1626 Trollingwood Hawflds RD
Mebane NC 27302 / US
04 / RUST, Jon
College of Textiles 1410
Box 8301
NCSU Campus
Raleigh NC 27695 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17811156.312.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37023
Priority number, dateUS201662348211P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348211 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214620
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469125
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:D04B21/00, D04B21/10, D04B21/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KETTENGEWIRK FÜR TEXTILE UND MEDIZINISCHE ANWENDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/16]
English:WARP KNIT FABRIC FOR TEXTILE AND MEDICAL APPLICATIONS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2019/16]
French:TISSU TRICOTÉ CHAÎNE POUR APPLICATIONS TEXTILES ET MÉDICALES ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1172785  (Faber Groep N.V) [X] 1, 3(1), 16 * entire document, especially Title, Asbtract, figs. 1-3, para[0014]-[0018]. * [Y] 2, 3(2), 17, 18(16, 17);
 [Y]US2001042388  (West et al.) [Y] 2, 3(2), 17, 18(16, 17) * entire document, especially figs. 1-5, para[0014]-[0017], [0019]. *;
 [A]GB2511484  (Brunet International Ltd.) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document. *;
 [A]US2003100954  (Schuldt-Hempe et al.) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document. *;
 [A]US2010192638  (Wall et al.) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document. *;
 [A]US2004049260  (Dong) [A] 1-3, 16-18 * entire document. *