Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472251

EP3472251 - SELF-CURING MIXED-METAL OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brisbane Materials Technology Pty Ltd
11 Machinery St.
Darra, Queensland 4076 / AU
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HARVEY, Michael
11 Machinery Street
Darra, Queensland 4076 / AU
02 / SURAWSKI, Peter
11 Machinery Street
Darra, Queensland 4076 / AU
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)De Clercq & Partners
Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17812317.015.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017AU50599
Priority number, dateAU2016090232015.06.2016         Original published format: AU 2016902320
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214675
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472251
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09D183/00, C03C17/00, C03C17/10, C03C17/25, C03C17/27, C03C17/28, C03C17/30, C09D1/00, C09D1/02, C23C18/00, C23C18/08, C23C18/12, H01G9/045, C01B33/26, H01B1/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SELBSTHÄRTENDE MISCHMETALLOXIDE[2019/17]
English:SELF-CURING MIXED-METAL OXIDES[2019/17]
French:OXYDES DE MÉTAUX MÉLANGÉS AUTO-DURCISSABLES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Search fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006142471  (SHINDO TAKUYA [JP]) [X] 1-16, 13-21, 25-26, 27-28 * examples 1, 3-4; paragraphs 0013-0015, 0030-0032, 0036-0037, 0049; claims 5, 7, 9-10 *;
 [X]US2009189510  (KANAMORI TAROU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5, 7-16, 18-21, 22, 25-26, 27-28 * abstract; paragraphs 0007, 0017, 0022, 0122; Fig 1-3; examples 8 and 9; claims 7-11 *;
 [X]WO9613459  (KODAK PATHE [FR], et al) [X] 1-18, 21-28 * abstract; claims 1, 5, 10, 14, 18; page 7, lines 24-27; page 4, lines 2-8; example 1, page 6, lines 2-15 and 29-33; page 3, lines 19-25 *;
 [X]US2001040785  (MISRA SUDHANSHU [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 6-16, 18, 21-22, 25-26, 28 * abstract, claim 1-2, 9, 18-19; paragraphs 0016, 0018 *;
 [X]US5401441  (ROBERT JEAN C [FR], et al) [X] 1-8, 11-16, 18, 20-21, 23, 25-26, 28 * claim 1, column 1, lines 5-22 *;
 [A]  - KOSMULSKI, M., "Attempt to Determine Pristine Points of Zero Charge of Nb2O5, Ta205, and Hf02", Langmuir, (19970000), vol. 13, no. 23, pages 6315 - 6320, XP055450073 [A] 1-28 * . abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la970469g
 [A]  - H. Arribart, M.-J. Azzopardi, J.-M. Berquier, V. Coustet, F. Creuzet, Xue-Yun Lin and J. Jupille, "Experimental characterization of hydroxyl groups and acid-base properties on flat oxide surfaces", Acid-base interactions : relevance to adhesion science and technology ; volume 2, Utrecht, (19910000), ISBN 90-6764-325-4, page 488, XP009514442 [A] 1-28 * . Note: this book reference was found in the internet using relevant keywords preface; page 488 *