Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471058

EP3471058 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING HUMAN BODY GENDER IN MICROWAVE IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHENZEN CCT THZ TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Room 430, 4th Floor, No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang Street
Bao'an District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN
For all designated states
China Communication Technology Co., Ltd.
The 1st Floor and the West Part of 2nd Floor
No. 37 Building Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road
Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
SHENZEN CCT THZ TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Room 430, 4th Floor, No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang Street
Bao'an District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN
For all designated states
China Communication Technology Co., Ltd.
The 1st Floor and the West Part of 2nd Floor
No.37 Building Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road
Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / QI, Chunchao
The East Part of 2nd Floor
No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518102 / CN
02 / LI, Zhiquan
The East Part of 2nd Floor
No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518102 / CN
03 / CHEN, Hanjiang
The East Part of 2nd Floor
No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518102 / CN
04 / WU, Guangsheng
The East Part of 2nd Floor
No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518102 / CN
05 / ZHAO, Shukai
The East Part of 2nd Floor
No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518102 / CN
06 / DING, Qing
The East Part of 2nd Floor
No. 37 Building
Chentian Industrial Zone
1st Baotian Road, Xixiang, Bao'an District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518102 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17812504.317.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN84631
Priority number, dateCN20161041008013.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610410080
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215393
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471058
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DES GESCHLECHTS EINES MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERS IN EINEM MIKROWELLENBILD[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING HUMAN BODY GENDER IN MICROWAVE IMAGE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER LE SEXE D'UN CORPS HUMAIN DANS UNE IMAGE À MICRO-ONDES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2018Translation filed 
24.10.2018National basic fee paid 
24.10.2018Search fee paid 
24.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
24.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[PX]CN106127732  (SHENZHEN THZ SCIENCE AND TECH INNOVATION INST, et al) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-19 *;
 [Y]CN105556508  (EYESMATCH LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0051] and [0137]-[0142], and figure 5 *;
 [Y]CN102567733  (BEIJING HUAHANG RADIO MEASUREMENT INST) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0006]-[0012], [0042], [0043] and [0102]-[0105] *;
 [Y]CN102540264  (BEIJING HUAHANG RADIO MEASUREMENT RES INST) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0007]-[0037] *;
 [A]CN101639349  (UNIV DONGHUA) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2002031246  (KAWANO TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *