Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474490

EP3474490 - SERVICE ACTIVATING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / JI, Hangui
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / HE, Feng
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Petit, Maxime , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17812549.827.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN86263
Priority number, dateCN20161043793217.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610437932
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215438
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474490
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L29/12
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DIENSTAKTIVIERUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2019/17]
English:SERVICE ACTIVATING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'ACTIVATION DE SERVICE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019Translation filed 
03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]CN1997037  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-14 * , description, page 5, line 2 to page 6, line 15 *;
 [A]CN101834792  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101621331  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101616024  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-14 * , the whole document *