Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473617

EP3473617 - HALOGENATED COMPOUND AND AXIALLY CHIRAL ISOMER THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medshine Discovery Inc.
Room 218, No.9 Gaoxin Road
Gaoxin Development District
Nanjing, Jiangsu 310032 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Jianfei
288 Futezhong Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 200131 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Yang
288 Futezhong Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 200131 / CN
03 / CHEN, Shuhui
288 Futezhong Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 200131 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date17812700.713.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN88031
Priority number, dateCN20161044080417.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610440804
CN20161051797904.07.2016         Original published format: CN201610517979
CN20161069352818.08.2016         Original published format: CN201610693528
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215589
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473617
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D249/08, C07D249/12, C07D249/10, A61K31/416, A61P9/10, A61P19/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:HALOGENIERTE VERBINDUNG UND AXIAL CHIRALES ISOMER DARAUS[2019/17]
English:HALOGENATED COMPOUND AND AXIALLY CHIRAL ISOMER THEREOF[2019/17]
French:COMPOSÉ HALOGÉNÉ ET SON ISOMÈRE CHIRAL AXIAL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]CN101918377  (ARDEA BIOSCIENCES INC) [X] 1, 2, 7, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0087]-[0101] and [0665]-[0676], description, paragraphs [0087]-[0101] and [0665]-[0676] * [Y] 3-6, 8-11, 13-16;
 [XY]CN102186832  (ARDEA BIOSCIENCES INC) [X] 1, 2, 7, 12-16 * , description, paragraphs [0182]-[0195] and [0915]-[0914], description, paragraphs [0182]-[0195] and [0915]-[0914] * [Y] 3-6, 8-11, 13-16;
 [Y]CN105622531  (NANJING MINGDE DRUG R & D CO LTD) [Y] 3-6, 8-11, 13-16 * , description, embodiment 1, and test case 1-6 *;
 [Y]CN105399694  (ZHEJIANG JINGXIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, et al) [Y] 3-6, 8-11, 13-16 * , description, paragraphs [0025]-[0039], and embodiments 1-4 *;
 [A]CN101083987  (ARDEA BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * , description, pages 6-7 and page 9, flow Ib *;
 [A]WO2015054960  (SUZHOU PENGXU PHARMATECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * , description, pages 6-7 *