Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471126

EP3471126 - CONTROL PANEL, SELF-PROPELLED SWITCH APPARATUS, AND POWER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Changzhou Globe Co., Ltd.
No.65 Xing Gang Road
Zhonglou Zone
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213023 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Feng
No.65 Xinggang Rd.
Zhonglou Zone
Changzhou Jiangsu 213023 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Bergenstråhle Group AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17812715.514.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN88216
Priority number, dateCN20161041958614.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610419586
CN20161041359614.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610413596
CN20161041224014.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610412240
CN20161041232114.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610412321
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215604
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471126
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01H27/06, A01D34/00, A01D75/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BEDIENFELD, SELBSTFAHRENDE SCHALTVORRICHTUNG UND LEISTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:CONTROL PANEL, SELF-PROPELLED SWITCH APPARATUS, AND POWER DEVICE[2019/16]
French:PANNEAU DE COMMANDE, APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION AUTOMOTEUR ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019Translation filed 
11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Search fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[PX]CN106105541  (CHANGZHOU GLOBE CO LTD) [PX] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0075], and figures 1-19 *;
 [PX]CN106034568  (CHANGZHOU GLOBE CO LTD) [PX] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0079], and figures 1-19 *;
 [PX]CN106057553  (CHANGZHOU GLOBE CO LTD) [PX] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0073], and figures 1-19 *;
 [PX]CN106063409  (CHANGZHOU GLOBE CO LTD) [PX] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0074], and figures 1-19 *;
 [Y]CN204616397U  (POSITEC POWER TOOLS SUZHOU CO) [Y] 1-6, 12-24 * , description, paragraphs [0004]-[0079], and figures 1-11 *;
 [Y]CN105325128  (NINGBO DELIN MACHINERY CO LTD) [Y] 1-6, 12-24 * , description, paragraphs [0006]-[0049], and figures 1-9 *;
 [X]CN104686049  (POSITEC POWER TOOLS SUZHOU CO) [X] 7-11 * , description, paragraphs [0005]-[0063], and figures 1-11 *;
 [A]JP2013099324  (CHIKUSUI CANYCOM INC) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US7165383  (LUTON JR JAMES J [US]) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN105432238  (NANJING CHERVON IND CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *