Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471826

EP3471826 - DEVICES AND METHODS TO REMOVE HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hong Kong Health and Beauty Limited
Rm 1212
12/F Kwong Sang Hong Centre
151- 153 Hoi Bun Rd.
151- 153 Hoi Bun Rd., Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Haiying
Rm 1212
12/F Kwong Sang Hong Centre
151- 153 Hoi Bun Rd.
Kwun Tong, Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Chaillot
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17812720.514.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN88260
Priority number, dateUS201662350193P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350193 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215609
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471826
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON HAAR[2019/17]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS TO REMOVE HAIR[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ENLEVER LES POILS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]CN104721968  (S AND Y ENTPR LLC) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0067]-[0098] in the description, figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]CN204563343U  (JIANGSU OULAIMEI LASER TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014]-[0015] in the description, figure 1 *;
 [A]CN101938951  (SYNERON MEDICAL LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101977560  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101232853  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003233138  (SPOONER GREG [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *