Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470400

EP3470400 - CRYSTAL FORM OF OZANIMOD, CRYSTAL FORM OF HYDROCHLORIDE THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crystal Pharmaceutical (Suzhou) Co., Ltd.
B4-301 Biobay
218 Xinghu Street
Suzhou Industrial Park
Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Minhua
B4-301 Biobay
218 Xinghu Street
Industrial Park
Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Yanfeng
B4-301 Biobay
218 Xinghu Street
Industrial Park
Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN
03 / ZHAI, Xiaoting
B4-301 Biobay
218 Xinghu Street
Industrial Park
Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN
04 / YAN, Kaiqiang
B4-301 Biobay
218 Xinghu Street
Industrial Park
Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN
05 / YANG, Chaohui
B4-301 Biobay
218 Xinghu Street
Industrial Park
Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN
06 / ZHANG, Xiaoyu
B4-301 Biobay
218 Xinghu Street
Industrial Park
Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17812728.814.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN88314
Priority number, dateCN20161041617914.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610416179
CN20161049391029.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610493910
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215617
Date:21.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470400
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07D271/06, A61K31/4245, A61P37/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:KRISTALLFORM VON OZANIMOD, KRISTALLFORM VON HYDROCHLORID DAVON UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:CRYSTAL FORM OF OZANIMOD, CRYSTAL FORM OF HYDROCHLORIDE THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR[2019/16]
French:FORME CRISTALLINE DE L'OZANIMOD, FORME CRISTALLINE DE SON HYDROCHLORIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
25.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XDI]US2011172202  (MARTINBOROUGH ESTHER [US], et al) [XD] 16-18 * paragraph [0281] - paragraph [0282] * [I] 1-15
International search[X]CN102762100  (RECEPTOS INC) [X] 1-36 * , description, paragraphs [0004], [0069], [0190] and [0398]-[0400], and page 100, compound 1 *;
 [PX]WO2016164180  (AUSPEX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [PX] 1-36 * , description, paragraphs [0002] and [0054], and embodiments 1-6 *;
 [X]WO2015066515  (RECEPTOS INC [US]) [X] 1-36 * , description, page 2, paragraph 2, page 3, 5th paragraph from the bottom, page 29, paragraph 1, page 98, paragraph 2 to page 99, paragraph 1 and page 139, compound 1 *