Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471562

EP3471562 - SYNTHETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HUMAN MILK OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR USE THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glycom A/S
Kogle Allé 4
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VIGSNÆS, Louise Kristine
Ravneholmsvej 20
2400 Copenhagen NV / DK
02 / MCCONNELL, Bruce
2 Chemin du Crêt à l'Igle
1814 La Tour de Peilz / CH
03 / ELISON, Emma
Ernst Ahlgrensgatan 4B
217 59 Malmö / SE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Inspicos P/S
Kogle Allé 2
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17812794.015.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017DK50198
Priority number, dateUS20161518339115.06.2016         Original published format: US201615183391
US20161518340415.06.2016         Original published format: US201615183404
US20161518343115.06.2016         Original published format: US201615183431
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215721
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471562
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:XN21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A23L33/125, A61K31/702
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYNTHETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MUTTERMILCHOLIGOSACCHARIDEN ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN[2019/17]
English:SYNTHETIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HUMAN MILK OLIGOSACCHARIDES FOR USE THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISORDERS[2019/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS SYNTHÉTIQUES COMPRENANT DES OLIGOSACCHARIDES DU LAIT HUMAIN POUR L'UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2013057061  (NESTEC SA (CH) [X] 1-24 * Cited in the application See entire document, in particular page 2, lines 1-4; page 3, line 20 page 4, line 7; page 4, lines 23-24; page 11, lines 16-19; page 14, lines 7-12; page 17, line 17 -page 18, line 2; and claims 1, 2, 5, 8 and 13-15 *;
 [X]WO2014187464  (GLYCOM A/S (DK) [X] 1, 7-8, 15, 19-24 * Cited in the application See abstract; page 8, lines 12-15; page 10, lines 12-14; page 12, lines 13-15; page 16, line 16 - page 18, line 7; page 21, line 22 - page 22, line 15; tables 1-3; example; and claims 1, 10-12, and 24 *;
 [X]WO2011119023  (N.V. NUTRICIA (NL) [X] 1-24 * See page 8, line 20 -page 10, line 8; page 11, lines 5-21; and claims 1, 7, 11, and 12-14 *;
 [X]WO2009082214  (N.V. NUTRICIA (NL) [X] 1-24 * See page 2, lines 23-30; page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 4; page 15, lines 17 - 29; and claims 1, and 6-8 *;
 [X]WO2007073192  (N.V. NUTRICIA (NL) [X] 1-24 * See page 1, lines 3-5; page 14, line 16 - page 15, line 8; page 15, lines 21-26; page 19, line 26 - page 20, line 7 and claims 1, 3, 7 and 11 *;
 [X]WO2015164021  (MJN U.S. HOLDINGS LLC (US) [X] 23-24 * See claims 1-2 and 18-19 *;
 [X]WO2009077352  (NESTEC S.A. (CH) [X] 23-24 * See abstract; page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 5; and claims 1 and 2 *;
 [X]WO9843495  (ABBOTT LABORATORIES (US) [X] 23-24 * See abstract; page 1, lines 10-14; and claims *;
 [PX]WO2016091265  (GLYCOM A/S (DK) [PX] 1-13, 15-17, 19-24 * See page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 19; page 5, lines 23-26; examples and claims *;
 [E]WO2017129639  (NESTEC S.A. (CH) [E] 1-21, 23-24 * See page 21, lines 19-20; and claims 1, 6-8, and 13-17 *;
 [E]WO2017129641  (NESTEC S.A. (CH) [E] 1, 6-8, 15-17, 19-24 * See page 1 , lines 15-32; page 22, lines 33-34; page 24, lines 9-17; page 27, lines 16-22; and claims 1-6, 9, 12 and 18 *;
 [E]WO2017129648  (NESTEC S.A. (CH) [E] 1-2, 6-8, 15-17, 19-24 * See page 1, lines 15-21; page 23, lines 28-32; page 24, lines 15-19; and claims 1-2, 5-6, 8, and 14-15 *;
 [E]WO2017129650  (NESTEC S.A. (CH) [E] 1-8, 15-21, 23-24 * See page 1, lines 19-31; page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 13; Page 21, lines 7-8; page 22, lines 4-15 and claims 1, 4-5, and 8 *